THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/12/2017 9:37:14 PM

Manolakos, Joshua James (CPSO#: 92827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Cardiology Associates
125 Bell Farm Road
Unit 307
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone: 7057351111
Fax: 7057351888
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Regional Health Cent
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: 7057289090
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Manolakos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Manolakos ( CPSO# 92827 )

Business Address:
Suite 307
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 735-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSHUA JAMES MANOLAKOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOLAKOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014