THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/12/2017 9:38:20 PM

Thompson, Robert Donald (CPSO#: 95450)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia
Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Mar 2017
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2017