THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/12/2017 4:41:21 PM

Jiang, Liangfu (CPSO#: 99224)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Wenzhou Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2012 to 23 Oct 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013