Public Register

The Public Register

By law, the College is required to maintain a register that includes specific information about each doctor and facility that is made available to the public. This is the College's public register, and it includes information about:

  • Doctors
  • Out-of-Hospital Premises

What’s Public (and What’s Not) About Doctors

The College’s “Public Register” includes information about every doctor licensed to practise medicine in Ontario, and doctors previously licensed by the College. The Public Register is accessed by using the “All Doctors Search” option or the “Registration Number Search” option. We have Tips for Using the Public Register.

In fulfilling our mandate to protect the public, we believe it’s important that the public have information to help them to decide who they wish to see for care. Information about doctors is obtained when they first register with the College, and it is updated regularly:  when they complete our annual renewal form, notify us of a change, or as a result of a College process.

If you have any questions about the information provided in the Public Register or need assistance, please contact our Public Advisory Service at 416-967-2603 or 1-800-268-7096, ext. 603.

The Public Register contains a wide variety of information, including:

  • Full name and former name (if any); gender; practice address(es), fax and telephone number(s); CPSO registration number; languages spoken, and, if applicable, the professional corporation name in which the doctor is a shareholder.
  • Registration status (e.g., Active Member; or Expired: Resignation from membership) and registration class (e.g., Independent Practice; or Postgraduate Education – the certificate held while in training) and pertinent dates.
  • Qualifications, including medical school from which the doctor’s medical degree was obtained and year of graduation; postgraduate medical training in Ontario (if available); recognized specialty designation (e.g., Family Medicine; Pediatrics; or Internal Medicine) and sub-specialty designation (e.g., Cardiology), if any; and pertinent dates.
  • The identity of each hospital and health facility in Ontario where the doctor has professional privileges to practise, and any revocations, suspensions or restrictions reported to the College by hospitals.
  • The terms, conditions and limitations (TCLs) on each doctor’s certificate of registration.  TCLs describe the conditions under which doctors can practise medicine, and are categorized as "standard" and "non-standard" (see Glossary of Terms, for more information).
  • A summary of allegations of professional misconduct or incompetence, if any, awaiting hearing by the Discipline Committee that relate to a doctor, including the “Notice of Hearing” that sets out the allegations, as well as the status of the discipline proceeding (e.g., scheduled hearing dates; whether the hearing has been adjourned; etc.).
  • If the Discipline Committee makes a finding of professional misconduct or incompetence against a doctor, a brief summary of the facts on which the finding was based; the penalty; and whether the finding is under appeal.
  • Information about an application for reinstatement of a doctor’s certificate of registration, including any scheduled hearing dates, the status of the proceeding, and the decision.
  • Information about allegation(s) of incapacity, if any, awaiting hearing by the Fitness to Practise Committee; and, if there is a finding of incapacity, a summary of the order made by the panel hearing the matter; and whether the finding is under appeal.
  • Findings of malpractice/professional negligence made on or after June 4, 2009.
  • Where a doctor has resigned and agreed to never practise again in Ontario during or as a result of an investigation or public complaint.

New: More information is now available as a result of our recent Transparency Initiative, including:

  • Current bail conditions, if any, which affect a physician’s right to practise.
  • Findings of guilt against a doctor under the Criminal Code, and findings of an offence under the Health Insurance Act, made on or after June 1, 2015, including the finding; the sentence; the fact of an appeal; and the pertinent dates.
  • Criminal Code and Health Insurance Act charges placed against a doctor, including the fact and content of the charge; and the place and date of the charge (if known). This information will be removed when the charge is no longer outstanding.
  • Information about current registration or medical licence held in another jurisdiction by a doctor, where known, from September 1, 2015.
  • Information about disciplinary findings by another medical regulatory or licensing authority made on or after September 1, 2015, including the facts and dates (where known), the jurisdiction, and the status of any appeals.
  • A Caution-in-Person outcome of an investigation that relates to a doctor, where the investigation commenced on or after January 1, 2015, unless it is overturned on appeal. A caution-in-person is issued by the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee when there is a significant concern about conduct or practice that can have a direct impact on patient care, safety, or the public interest if it is not addressed.
  • A Specified Continuing Education or Remediation Program (SCERP) outcome of an investigation that relates to a doctor, where the investigation commenced on or after January 1, 2015, unless it is overturned on appeal; and, when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed, a notation to that effect. SCERPs are ordered if a voluntary agreement can’t be reached with the doctor.
  • The location of medical records, if a doctor is no longer practising in Ontario and we have received this information.

The following information is not available on the Public Register. We believe that any information provided to the public – whether it is about our processes or doctors — should be relevant, enhance public confidence, and be balanced with fairness and respect for each doctor’s privacy. The following information is not included on the Public Register:

  • Email address; mailing address (if not his or her primary practice address); and date of birth.
  • Scope of practice; particular area of interest; or whether a doctor performs a particular procedure or has expertise in a particular area.
  • Quality assurance results, such as the outcome of peer assessments of physicians’ practices.
  • Settlements of malpractice/professional negligence civil lawsuits.
  • The fact of an investigation – be it a complaint from the public, an inquiry into a physician’s capacity to practise related to their health, or an investigation into a mandatory report or a concern arising from another source.
  • The outcome of investigations that find no concerns with the physician’s care or conduct or find concerns of a minor nature that pose little risk to the public, including “no action”; “advice/recommendation”; or “remedial agreement” outcomes.
  • Terms, conditions or limitations on a doctor’s certificate of registration that are no longer in effect.

Under the provisions of the Health Professions Procedural Code, the Registrar may refuse to disclose to an individual or post on the College website information that is available to the public if the Registrar "has reasonable grounds to believe that this information is obsolete and no longer relevant to the physician's suitability to practice." The following principles are considered by the Registrar in exercising discretion in respect of a physician's request to have information removed from the Public Register.

About Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP)

The Out-of-Hospital Premises Inspection Program (OHPIP) was established by regulation in April 2010 to inspect out-of-hospital premises where certain procedures are carried out under anesthesia or sedation as covered by the regulation. The College oversees the program’s activities through its Premises Inspection Committee (PIC).

PIC has the authority to prevent high-risk procedures from being performed in premises that do not meet the standards.  

The information about outcomes/status associated with each OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For each premises, associated information is displayed starting from January 31, 2013. There are three possible outcomes and two administrative statuses that could be designated and made available to the public through the College website. In some instances, further details about the outcome/status are provided. The outcomes are as follows: 

  • Pass. Premises are awarded a pass when they meet all requirements of an OHPIP inspection.

  • Pass with conditions. When a premises receives a pass with conditions, details regarding the specific conditions are provided. The premises can generally continue to perform OHP procedures. This outcome means that the premises will need to comply with specified requirements.

  • Fail. When a premises fails an inspection, doctors at the premises must cease practising those OHP procedures - thereby removing any potential risk to the public. Premises can fail inspections for a number of reasons, including: breaches in infection control, failure to meet conditions or physician qualifications to perform procedures. The reasons for the fail outcome are provided.

The statuses are as follows:

  • Pending. The pending status will be assigned in circumstances where inspections are in progress. 

  • Withdrawal. The withdrawal status is assigned when the premises have withdrawn from the program or from performing OHP procedures. Premises that have this status are not permitted to perform OHP procedures but may still be open and performing non-OHP procedures.

Glossary of Terms

The Public Register contains a wide variety of information about doctors, which is obtained when doctors first register with the College, and is updated regularly:  when they complete our annual renewal form, notify us of a change, or as a result of a College process.

Some of the terms used in the Public Register reflect language from the Regulated Health Professions Act, the medical professions’ governing legislation, and have a particular meaning in the regulatory environment. This glossary is provided to explain these terms, to the extent possible, in layman’s terms. If you have any questions about the information provided in the Public Register, please contact our Public Advisory Service at 416-967-2603 or 1-800-268-7096, ext. 603.

1. Certificate of Registration

A “certificate of registration” or medical licence, is issued by the College and provides authorization to practise medicine in Ontario. There are various categories or “classes” of certificates of registration and each describes the type of practice permitted. The physician’s registration class is shown under “Current Registration” on the Summary page. There are six classes of certificates of registration:

  1. Independent Practice
  2. Postgraduate Education
  3. Restricted
  4. Academic Practice
  5. Academic Visitor
  6. Short Duration
  1. Independent Practice
  • permits independent practice in the areas of medicine in which the physician is educated and experienced. Approximately 80% of doctors in Ontario have this class of certificate. It is usually obtained after postgraduate residency medical training is completed and is held throughout their medical career.
  1. Postgraduate Education
  • permits supervised practice after graduation from medical school, and is required for postgraduate (residency) medical training at an Ontario medical school;
  • may practice only as required by the postgraduate education program in which the physician is enrolled at an Ontario medical school;
  • may prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit of the medical school;
  • may not charge a fee for medical services;
  • certificate expires when enrolment in postgraduate medical education ceases.
  1. Restricted
  • must practice in accordance with the specific terms and conditions imposed on the certificate.
  1. Academic Practice
  • may practice only in the medical school department in which the physician holds an academic appointment;
  • may practice only to the extent required by the appointment;
  • certificate expires when the academic appointment ends.
  1. Academic Visitor
  • may practice only in the medical school department in which the physician holds an academic appointment;
  • may practice only to the extent required by the appointment;
  • certificate may be issued for up to fifteen months only.
  1. Short Duration
  • may practice only to the extent required by the short duration appointment at a public hospital, psychiatric facility or medical school;
  • must practice under supervision;
  • certificate valid for up to thirty days only;
  • issued only to fill urgent, short-term need or to provide education to Ontario physicians.

2. Specialty Designation 

Doctors practising as specialists must be:

  1. Certified by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada (RCPSC) in a specialty or subspecialty of the profession to which the term, title or designation relates (for example, obstetrics and gynecology; cardiology; orthopedic surgery; dermatology).
  2. Certified by the College of Family Physicians of Canada (CFPC) in a specialty or subspecialty of the profession to which the term, title or designated relates (i.e., family medicine).
  3. Formally recognized in writing by the College as a specialist in the specialty or subspecialty of the profession to which the term, title or designation relates.
  1. Specialty Designation: RCPSC Certification
  • Granted by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada (RCPSC), the national examining and certifying body for medical specialists in Canada.
  • RCPSC also accredits Canadian specialty training programs. 
  • If a doctor is certified by the RCPSC, the disciplines (e.g., obstetrics and gynecology; cardiology; orthopedic surgery; dermatology) in which the physician is certified are noted on the Summary page, under “Specialties”.  
  1. Specialty Designation: CFPC Certification
  • Granted by the College of Family Physicians of Canada (CFPC), the national examining and certifying body for family medicine practitioners in Canada.
  • CFPC also accredits family medicine training programs in Canada.
  • If a doctor is certified by the CFPC, “family medicine” is noted on the Summary page, under “Specialties”.
  1. Specialty Designation: CPSO Recognized Specialist
  • Granted by the College to doctors who are not certified by the CFPC or RCPSC and that meet the criteria specified in the College's registration policy, Specialist Recognition Criteria in Ontario.
  • If a physician has CPSO Recognized Specialist status, this status and the discipline (e.g., family medicine, cardiology, internal medicine) in which the physician is recognized as a specialist is noted on the Summary page, under “Specialties”.

Doctors who do not have any specialty designation are considered General Practitioners, and the “Specialties” section of the Summary page will indicate “none”.

General Practitioner

  • In the mid-1990s, it became a requirement of registration in Ontario for new family physicians to be certified by the CFPC (see Specialty Designation).
  • For Ontario graduates, certification is gained after residency training.
  • Family physicians who trained prior to 1993 have the option of gaining certification through a practice-eligibility route, but certification is not mandatory. These physicians are deemed general practitioners.
  • If a physician is a general practitioner, the Specialties designation section of the Summary page will indicate “none”.

3. Terms, Conditions and Limitations (TCLs)

  • Terms, conditions, and limitations describes the conditions under which doctors can practise medicine, and are categorized as "standard" and "non-standard"
  • Both standard and non-standard TCLs are shown under “Terms and Conditions” on the “Registration Details” page. Non-standard TCLs are also show under “Practice Restrictions” on the “Additional Details” page, when in effect.
  1. TCLs: Standard

Every certificate under every registration class carries the standard term, condition and limitation that the physician may practise only in the areas of medicine in which he or she is educated and experienced. For the independent practice class, this is the only term, condition and limitation.

For other registration classes, there are additional standard terms, conditions and limitations that apply. For example, physicians with an academic practice certificate may practice only in the medical school department in which they hold an academic appointment; may practice only to the extent required by the appointment; and the certificate expires when the academic appointment ends. See item “1. Certificate of Registration”, above, for further examples.

The only class of registration that has non-standard terms, conditions and limitations is the restricted class, as explained below.

  1. TCLs: Non-standard

Certain College committees – Registration; Inquiries, Complaints and Reports; Discipline; and Fitness to Practise Committees, are authorized to impose specified terms, conditions and limitations on a certificate of registration. Also, under certain circumstances, physicians can self-impose specified terms, conditions and limitations on their certificate as part of an “Undertaking” to the College.

An “Undertaking” is a binding and enforceable agreement between the College and the physician, similar to a contract. Generally, Undertakings reflect an agreement between the physician and the College where the College decides that such an agreement protects the public interest. For example, a doctor may enter an Undertaking to restrict his/her practice where there has been a concern raised about that practice area and the physician is prepared to make an agreement to practice differently – or not practice at all –  and the public is protected.  An Undertaking sets out an obligation or restriction that a physician is giving to the College (i.e., an agreement by the doctor to cease to practise medicine until a condition is met; to abide by practice restrictions; to practise under clinical supervision; to resign his/her licence and never apply for reinstatement in Ontario or apply for a licence in another jurisdiction, for example).

A physician may agree to enter into an Undertaking with the College for a variety of reasons and in a variety of contexts. While physicians may give an Undertaking to the College where they are seeking to resolve an investigation or a referral to discipline, Undertakings may also be given when an issue arises from a practice assessment, for example. They can also be given when doctors are re-entering practice after an absence from clinical practice; as part of the registration process with the College; or when they simply wish to restrict their practice in some way.

Whenever these “non-standard” terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on a certificate, it automatically becomes a restricted certificate.

  • TCLs: Non-standard – Registration Committee

The Registration Committee of the College has the authority to grant a restricted certificate of registration, in certain circumstances (for example, to individuals who have not successfully completed all of the examination requirements). In these circumstances, specified terms, conditions and limitations are ordered to safeguard the public (e.g., monitoring or supervisory arrangements, with accountability to the College for full compliance with the arrangements and for completing all examinations or successful completion of a practice assessment). When TCLs are ordered by the Registration Committee, the specified restrictions are included on the public register.

  • TCLs: Non-standard – Discipline; Fitness to Practise; and Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committees

Both the Discipline Committee, which hears allegations of professional misconduct or incompetence, and the Fitness to Practise Committee, which hears allegations of incapacity, can order that terms, conditions and limitations be imposed on a physician’s certificate of registration. When TCLs are ordered by either committee, the specified restrictions are included on the public register.

The Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee* can make an interim order to impose terms, conditions and limitations on the physician’s certificate of registration, after it has referred specified allegations to the Discipline Committee or after it has made a referral to the Fitness to Practise Committee. TCLs imposed by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee will appear on the public register for as long as they remain in force.

*Effective June 4, 2009, under an amendment to the RHPA, the member-specific functions of the Executive Committee transferred to a new committee – the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee. Previously, it was the Executive Committee that had the authority to make an interim order to impose terms, conditions and limitations on the physician’s certificate of registration, after it had referred specified allegations to the Discipline Committee or after it had made a referral to the Fitness to Practise Committee. TCLs imposed by the Executive Committee will appear on the public register for as long as they remain in force.

4. Member-reported Findings of Malpractice or Professional Negligence

On June 4, 2009, Section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 of the Regulated Health Professions Act, was revised to now require doctors to report to the College findings of malpractice or professional negligence. Any such finding is noted on the public register (see the “Additional Details” page of Doctor Search). If no finding of malpractice or professional negligence has been made against a doctor since June 4, 2009, and reported to the College, the public register will note “No findings reported since June 4, 2009.”

5. Other Notices

  1. Criminal Charges

Effective May 29, 2015, the College By-laws require that where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the following is to be posted on the public register:

  • the fact and content of the charge
  • date and place of the charge, if known to the College.
  1. Criminal Findings

If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or of an offence under the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require the following to be posted on the public register if the information is known to the College:

  • summary of the finding of guilt,
  • the sentence
  • a notation that the finding is under appeal (if applicable and if the College knows of the appeal) (notation will remain until the appeal is finally disposed of)
  • dates of the finding of guilt, sentence and appeal
  1. Bail Conditions

Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require that where a member,  following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal, has any currently existing conditions of release ("bail conditions") that relate to the member’s practice of medicine and are known to the College, the bail conditions are to be posted on the public register.

  1. Cautions-in-Person

For decisions of the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a “caution-in-person”, the College By-laws require that a summary of the decision be posted on the register.

If the decision has been appealed, a notation to that effect will be posted as well, and if the decision is overturned on appeal or review, the summary will be removed from the register.

A “caution-in-person” is one of the dispositions that the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to appear before a panel of the Committee to be cautioned.

Note that this posting requirement applies only to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of College investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

  1. SCERPS

For decisions of the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that a summary of the decision be posted on the register

A notation will also be posted on the register when all elements of the SCERP have been completed.  If the decision has been appealed, a notation to that effect will be posted as well, and if the decision is overturned on appeal or review, the summary will be removed from the register.

A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member.

Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of College investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

6. Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) Registry

The College also conducts inspection/assessments of “out-of-hospital premises” where certain procedures are carried out in the community setting under anesthesia or sedation. We maintain a registry of all premises that have been inspected under the program, and we report on the results of the inspection/assessments. The following terms may be used in inspection reports:

  1. OHP Nurse Assessment Coordinator (NAC)

The Nurse Assessment Coordinator is responsible for the overall coordination of the inspection of out-of-hospital premises (OHP). He or she ensures:

  • that the premises is prepared for an inspection;
  • all of the components of an inspection are complete;
  • that any necessary follow-up on items identified through the inspection process is completed.
  1. OHP Medical Director

The OHP must appoint a Medical Director (a physician holding a certificate of registration from the College). Each OHP must have a designated Medical Director who is responsible for all aspects of running an OHP. This includes:

  • hiring appropriately qualified staff;
  • ensuring all the policy and procedures are in place and up-to-date;
  • working with the College to address any matters that arise in the context of an inspection.
  1. OHP Premises Inspection Committee (PIC) 

This Committee of the College governs the premises inspection program and is responsible for:

  • approving policies;
  • ensuring assessors are appointed to complete inspections;
  • reviewing inspection reports and determining outcomes.
  1. OHP Change in Scope

Physicians who do not meet OHP Physician Qualification standards must successfully complete a Change in Scope of Practice application process, which may include demonstrating to the College their education, training, and/or competency in the area of practice.

Finding a New Doctor

It can sometimes be difficult to find a new doctor, particularly if there is a shortage of physicians in the area where you live. If you're trying to find a new doctor, you may wish to try the following strategies:

Health Care Connect

Health Care Connect is a Ministry of Health and Long-Term Care (MOHLTC) program which helps Ontarians without a family health care provider find one. 
The program refers people without a regular family health care provider to physicians and nurse practitioners who are accepting new patients in their community. To register for the Health Care Connect program, call 1-800-445-1822, or for more information, visit the MOHLTC website at:http://health.gov.on.ca/en/ms/healthcareconnect/public/

Local Hospital(s)

Hospitals often know which physicians with privileges or on staff are accepting new patients, and may be able to provide a few contacts.

Community Health Centre(s)

Community health centres are organizations that provide primary health care and prevention programs through physicians and a variety of other health professionals. If you have a local community health centre, it may be taking new patients. Keep in mind that most community health centres only provide services to people who live within their particular community (i.e., within their “catchment area”) and/or target populations. A list of community health centres in Ontario is available on the Ontario Ministry of Health and Long-Term Care’s website at:http://www.health.gov.on.ca/english/public/contact/chc/chcloc_mn.html

Local newspapers

Some physicians, including those who are new to an area or who are beginning to establish a practice, will advertise that they are accepting new patients. 

Tips for Using the Public Register

There are a number of ways to conduct a search of the Public Register database. Please note that you DO NOT need to complete all fields when searching for a doctor, and if incorrect information is entered, no matches/no results may be found.

If you have any questions or need assistance, please contact our Public Advisory Service at 416-967-2603 or 1-800-268-7096, ext. 603.

1. All Doctors Search

Getting Started: If you know the last name of the doctor you are looking for, enter it, and the initial of his or her first name, if known. Entering LESS rather than more information will help you obtain optimal search results.

In addition to finding a particular doctor by entering his or her name, you can conduct a general search for doctor(s) by categories of information, such as:

  • gender
  • family doctor or specialist
  • location of practice
  • hospital where the doctor has privileges
  • language of service other than English

When trying to locate doctors in your area, or by another category listed above, DO NOT complete the “Discipline and Fitness to Practise” field located at the bottom of the All Doctor Search (because using this field narrows the results to only physicians with a discipline history). The search results will always indicate if any of the listed physicians have a discipline history. To conduct a general search for doctors with a discipline history, see search option 3, below, for instructions.

2. Registration Number Search

Use this search option if you know the doctor’s five or six digit registration number.

3. Discipline and/or Fitness to Practise Search

You can conduct a general search for doctors who are currently facing allegations of professional misconduct, incompetence or incapacity (i.e., possible concerns about the doctor’s fitness to practise medicine related to his or her health); and/or you can search for doctors who have a discipline or fitness to practise history.

When applicable to the doctor, the following information is included in the Additional Details section:

  • a summary of allegations of professional misconduct or incompetence that are currently referred for a hearing before the Discipline Committee, including the “Notice of Hearing”; or a summary of allegations of incapacity that are currently referred for a hearing before the Fitness to Practise Committee;
  • any practice restrictions that are in effect;
  • any past findings of the Discipline Committee, including a brief summary of the facts on which the finding was based; the penalty; and a PDF of the full decision, and reasons for the decision (available online only for cases from 1992 to the present).
  • any past findings of the Fitness to Practise Committee.

Conducting Discipline/Fitness to Practise Searches

The discipline/fitness to practise fields are located at the bottom of the All Doctors Search page.

To find all doctors with a previous discipline or fitness to practise finding:

  1. Select “show only records with past decisions”. To narrow the search results, follow steps 2-5, if desired.
  2. To search alphabetically, type in the first letter of the last name. For example, type in “A” and all physicians with a last name beginning with the letter “A” with a previous discipline or fitness to practise finding will be listed.
  3. To narrow the results by a category, enter information into the relevant field. For example, to locate all family physicians with a discipline or fitness to practise finding, choose “Family Doctor” in the “Physician Type” field.
  4. Add a keyword or phrase, such as “narcotics”, to further define your search.
  5. If you are looking for a physician who has had his or her certificate of registration revoked, also select “All physicians” from the Registration Status field (the default setting is to physicians currently registered to practise medicine in the province).

To find all doctors with a current referral to the Discipline or Fitness to Practise Committee:

  1. Select “show only records with current referrals”. Follow the second through fourth steps above, if desired.