Council Updates

2014

May 29-30, 2014

04/06/2014 Council Award to Dr. Helen Ward; Provide Feedback on New Consultations; Transparency Initiative; Registration Policy Update; Other News

March 7, 2014

12/03/2014 Council Award to Dr. Keyna Bracken; Consultation Updates; New Consultation; Quality Management Partnership; Other News

2013

December 5-6, 2013

12/12/2013 Dr. Marc Gabel becomes President; Council Award to Dr. Anne-Marie Guerguerian; New Consultations; Completed Consultations; Other News

September 16, 2013

16/09/2013 Dr. Paul Mulzer Recognized; Consulting with the Profession and Public; Policy News; Revised Standards; Other News

May 30-31, 2013

06/06/2013 Dr. Yvon Gagnon - Council Award Recipient; Transparency of College Information; eHealth; Physicians and Social Media; By-law Updates; and more ...

February 26, 2013

01/03/2013 Council Award; New Consultation and Updates; A new way to connect; District Election Enhancements; GPPA now a CPD Tracking Organization

Special Council Meeting - January 31, 2013

01/02/2013 The Council of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario has passed a by-law that allows the results of out-of-hospital premises inspections to be made public. College inspections ensure that facilities are properly equipped and staffed in the interest of patient safety.

2012

Special Council Meeting, December 20, 2012

21/12/2012 Releasing Out-of-Hospital Premises outcomes and status: Proposed By-law

December 3-4, 2012

11/12/2012 New President; Council Award; Consultation Feedback; Policies Approved; Expanded Scope for Pharmacists; Partnership with Cancer Care Ontario; Transparency; Pricing Strategy for IHFs and OHPs

September 6, 2012

14/09/2012 Highlights of 2011 on Video; Mandatory and Permissive Reporting; Delegation of Controlled Acts; Policy Rescinded; Draft By-Law Consultation; Physician Council Members and Conflicts; High marks for re-training course for FPs; Criminal Record Screening

May 31 - June 1, 2012

07/06/2012 Council Award; Four Revised Policies Approved; Council Approves Four Policies for Consultation; Interprofessional Care Toolkit; By-law Update; Annual Fee Ratified

February 24, 2012

29/02/2012 Dr. Donald Low receives Council Award; No “spousal exemption” to sexual abuse mandatory revocation; Criteria for CPD programs; Evaluation of registration pathways and policies; Supervision of candidates with restricted licences; By-Law amendment; Regulation of Physician Assistants; After OxyContin: collaborate closely with pharmacists