Discipline Committee Schedule

All hearings are held at the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, 80 College Street, Toronto, and commence at 9:00 a.m. in the first floor hearing chamber, unless otherwise stated. The physician’s current practice location as indicated on the Public Register is noted. This schedule is subject to change. If you plan to attend, or for further information, please contact the Communications Department by email or by telephone at 416-967-2611.

Directions to the College available here.


September 2016

Doctor

Hearing Date

Summary of Allegations

FOOTE, Clary Jefferson
*(Practice address not available)

September 15
Reprimand

Start time is 12:15 p.m.

On January 7, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Clary Jefferson Foote committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional.

On July 19, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Foote appear before the Committee to be reprimanded.

MARGALIOT, Zvi
*(Mississauga)

September 19 & 22

  • Engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient
  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

BOTROS, Wagdy Abdalla
*(Practice address not available)

September 23
Penalty Hearing

 

On March 7, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

HORRI, Mehdi
*(Estevan)

September 26

  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

October 2016

Doctor

Hearing Date

Summary of Allegations

RUGGLES, Janice Louise
*(Pickering)

October 5

  • Failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.
  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
  • Incompetence.

SEKHON, Rajinder Singh
*(Ajax)

October 12

  • Engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient
  • Failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.
  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
  • Incompetence.

HORRI, Mehdi
*(Estevan)

October 13

 

  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

RUGGIERO, Donato Anthony
*(Toronto)

October 14
Penalty Hearing

On August 23, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Donato Anthony Ruggiero committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient.

CROZIER, Robert Samuel
*(Practice address not available)

October 17 – 21

  • Engaged in the sexual abuse of  patients
  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
  • Found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise

BRAND, Christopher Paul
*(Brechin)

October 18

  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
  • Engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician

EINSTOSS, Howard Sheldon
*(Practice address not available)

October 19
Reprimand at 12:15 p.m.

On April 12, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Howard Sheldon Einstoss committed professional misconduct in that:  he has engaged in the sexual abuse of patients; and, he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

On April 12, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Einstoss appear before the Committee to be reprimanded.

GILL, Paramjit
*(Brampton)

October 20

  • Failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.
  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
  • Contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration

GALEA, Anthony Michael
*(Toronto)

October 24 & 25

  • Found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise
  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

ISCOVE, Melvyn Lawrence
*(Toronto)

October 24
Motion

  • Engaged in the sexual abuse of  patients
  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
  • Engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician

MARSHALL, Daniel Robert
*(Practice Address Not Available)

October 25
Reprimand at 12:15 p.m.

On March 28, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons found that Dr. Daniel Robert Marshall committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; and in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.

On September 16, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Marshall appear before the Committee to be reprimanded.

CLOWATER, Julie Lee
*(Practice Address Not Available)

October 26
Reprimand at 12:15 p.m.

On May 19, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Julie Lee Clowater has committed an act of professional misconduct in that she has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

On July 22, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Clowater appear before the Committee to be reprimanded.

LUCAS, Jan Pieter
*(Practice address not available)

October 27

  • Failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

DI PAOLA, Francesca Anne
*(Toronto)

October 27

Will be held at:
ASAP Reporting Services
333 Bay Street, Toronto, ON

  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

PILARSKI, Barbara Anne
*(Toronto)

October 31

  • Failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.
  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
  • Incompetence.

JOHNSTON, Kevin
*(Practice Address Not Available)

October 31

Start time is 10:30 a.m. in 3rd Floor Council Chambers

  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
  • Engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician

Directions to CPSO, 80 College Street, Toronto, ON

(north side of College at Elizabeth Street)

By public transit

  • From the Queen's Park subway station (University-Spadina line): one block east of University Avenue
  • From the College subway station (Yonge line): two blocks west of Yonge Street
  • The Carlton/College streetcar stops in front of the CPSO at Elizabeth Street/Dr. Emily Stowe Way

Parking

Underground parking is available at College Park, 777 Bay Street. Enter on the east side of Bay Street, south of College.

View Larger Map