skip to content

Council Meetings

Council meetings are held four times a year to review the CPSO’s activities.

Print page icon

In the interest of public health and safety due to the COVID-19 pandemic, Council meetings will take place online and be live streamed for observers.  If you would like to observe a CPSO Council meeting, please complete the online registration form.

Upcoming Council Meetings

  • Thursday, December 9 and Friday, December 10, 2021
  • Thursday, March 3 and Friday, March 4, 2022
  • Thursday, June 16 and Friday, June 17, 2022
  • Thursday, September 22 and Friday, September 23, 2022
  • Thursday, December 8 and Friday, December 9, 2022

Council materials archive