Fam, Alice Poh Nyuk (CPSO#: 62586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone: (705) 759-5613
Fax: (705) 759-7466
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: (705) 759-3682
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. D. Brooks ( CPSO# 26921 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. D. Burrows ( CPSO# 50233 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. E. Barrett ( CPSO# 56931 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. S. Fratesi ( CPSO# 27368 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Fam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5613

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 08 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALICE POH NYUK FAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Mar 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1991