Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Sep 2005
Summary:
On September 29, 2005, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Prebtani committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice medicine. The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that the Registrar suspend Dr. Prebtani(s certificate of registration for three (3) months, commencing thirty (30) days after the date of this order, two (2) months of which suspension shall be suspended provided that Dr. Prebtani successfully completes, at his own expense, a College-approved Boundaries Course and a College-approved Anger Management Course and provides proof thereof to the College.
Dr. Prebtani appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court on October 19, 2005, which stayed the decision of the Discipline Committee pending the outcome of the appeal. On December 8, 2008, Dr. Prebtani discontinued his appeal. Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee is in effect.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 2008-12-08
Hearing Date(s): Sep 29, 2005