Abaeian, Mitra (CPSO#: 93518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300-100 Marie Curie Pvt
Ottawa ON  K1N 1A2
Phone: (613)564-3950 Ext. 450
Fax: 613-564-6627
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 15 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MITRA ABAEIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABAEIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 02 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015