Abaskharoun, Ramy Rasmi Danial (CPSO#: 76220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:McGill University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 511
1385 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone: (613) 736-7365
Fax: (613) 736-5999
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ramy Abaskharoun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abaskharoun ( CPSO# 76220 )

Business Address:
511 - 1385 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone Number: (613) 736-7365

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 21 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMY RASMI DANIAL ABASKHAROUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABASKHAROUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2005