Abawi, Walid (CPSO#: 62685)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Calgary, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rudd Clinic
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 597-0997
Fax: (416) 597-2912
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2227 S MILWAY 303
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Canada
Phone: (905) 569-7007
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Walid Abawi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Abawi ( CPSO# 62685 )

Business Address:
Rudd Clinic
825 - 123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 597-0997

Business Address:
Suite 303
2227 S Milway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALID ABAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABAWI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2014
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2014
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 11 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 11 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 09 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2017

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Sep 2013
Summary:

On September 12, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Walid Abawi committed an act 
of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice 
of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
The Committee found that while working at a hospital, Dr. Abawi led a nurse into a bathroom, 
and made unwanted and inappropriate sexual advances and remarks, trying to hug her and kiss 
her twice and then resting his body against the closed bathroom door. When the nurse stated she 
was leaving, Dr. Abawi did not stand in her way. The Committee found that in the context of the 
encounter, Dr. Abawi briefly confined the nurse without her consent, by his unwanted advances, 
his physical blocking of the door and the resulting psychological intimidation.  
 
On February 10, 2014, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    Dr. Abawi appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
2.    the Registrar suspend Dr. Abawi's certificate of registration for a period of four (4) 
      months, to commence at 12:00 a.m. February 11, 2014. 
 
3.    the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Abawi's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      (i)   Dr. Abawi shall successfully complete, at his own expense, individualized 
            instruction in professionalism and medical ethics with a College approved 
            instructor within twelve (12) months of this Order.  The instruction is to be on a 
            one-to-one basis, for a minimum of five (5), two (2) hour sessions; 
 
      (ii)  Dr. Abawi shall be subject to workplace monitoring by a regulated health 
            professional, approved by the College, who executes an undertaking with the 
            College in the form attached as Appendix "A" (the "Practice Monitor").  
            Monitoring shall continue for a minimum period of eighteen (18) months at each 
            of Dr. Abawi's practice locations and shall cease at that time unless the College in 
            its sole discretion, determines that Dr. Abawi's conduct in the workplace is 
            unsatisfactory.  If it is determined that his conduct in the workplace is 
            unsatisfactory, the monitoring shall continue for a minimum period of an 
            additional six months at which time a further determination will be made by the 
            College, in its sole discretion, if further monitoring is necessary, and if so, Dr. 
            Abwai shall be subject to further monitoring until his conduct is deemed 
            satisfactory by the College;  
 
      (iii) The Practice Monitor(s) shall work at the same location as Dr. Abawi and shall be 
            required to, among other things: 
  
            (a)   provide written reports to the College on a monthly basis.  Such reports 
                  are to include information regarding Dr. Abawi's conduct, behavior, and 
                  professionalism including information provided to the Practice Monitor by 
                  nurses, medical staff and/or any other staff working directly or indirectly 
                  with Dr. Abawi; and 
 
            (b)   provide immediate reporting to the College if the Practice Monitor has any 
                  concerns about Dr. Abawi's conduct, behavior or professionalism or forms 
                  the view that patients or people in the workplace may be at risk of harm or 
                  forms the view that he is not in compliance with the panel's Order; 
 
      (iv)  Dr. Abawi shall provide an executed Appendix "A" from a College approved 
            Practice Monitor no later than thirty (30) days before he resumes practice 
            following his suspension.   If the person who has given an undertaking in 
            Appendix "A" is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, or the College 
            determines the Practice Monitor is no longer acceptable, Dr. Abawi shall, within 
            twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in 
            the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College 
            and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.  If Dr. Abawi is 
            unable to obtain a Practice Monitor on the terms set out in this Order, he shall 
            cease practicing medicine until such time as he has obtained a Practice Monitor 
            acceptable to the College on the terms set out above; 
 
      (v)   Dr. Abawi shall provide written notice to the College at least thirty (30) days 
            before seeking privileges, employment or any other position, at any hospital, 
            independent health facility, out-of-hospital premise, or any other location.  Dr. 
            Abawi shall inform the College within ten (10) days of the date he receives notice 
            that he has been granted such privileges, employment or position.  Dr. Abawi 
            shall ensure that he has obtained an undertaking in the form of Appendix "A" 
            from a College-approved regulated health professional who works at that location 
            and shall provide same to the College before commencing work at such location; 
 
      (vi)  With respect to Dr. Abawi's locum coverage at Temiskaming Hospital, Dr. Abawi 
            shall provide the Chief of Staff and the Chief of Surgery with copies of the panel's 
            Decision and Reasons for Decision dated September 12, 2013 and a copy this 
            Order and provide proof of same within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order. 
             Dr. Abawi shall advise the Chief of Staff and the Chief of Surgery that the 
            College will be making inquiries on an quarterly basis with respect to Dr. Abawi's 
            conduct, behavior and professionalism at Temiskaming Hospital. 
 
      (vii) Dr. Abawi shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing 
            the terms of this Order. 
 
5.    Dr. Abawi pay the College costs in the amount of $26,760.00 within ninety (90) days 
      from the date of this Order. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 17-19, May 6, May 8, 21, 2013