Abbas, Harith Abdulkhither (CPSO#: 90802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Center
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Department of Surgery
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Erindale Orthopaedic
Rehabilitation Centre
1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 1E3
Canada
Phone: (905) 306-1200
Fax: (905) 306-1201
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harith Abbas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 23 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Harith Abbas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abbas ( CPSO# 90802 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Center
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Department of Surgery
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 1E3
Phone Number: (905) 306-1200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARITH ABDULKHITHER ABBAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012