Abd ElMotaal, Essam Ahmed Youssef (CPSO#: 91788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Benha University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1001 Queen St. West
Toronto ON  M6J1H4
Phone: 416-353-8501 Ext. 34574
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Essam AbdElMotaal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Abd ElMotaal ( CPSO# 91788 )

Business Address:
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (613) 770-0141

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESSAM AHMED YOUSSEF ABD ELMOTAAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABD ELMOTAAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Aug 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 14 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015