Abdalian, Rupert Sevag (CPSO#: 79278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, French

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2038 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M1R 1V2
Phone: (416) 447-7000
Fax: (416) 447-7072
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Rupert Abdalian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abdalian ( CPSO# 79278 )

Business Address:
2038 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M1R 1V2
Phone Number: (416) 447-7000

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUPERT SEVAG ABDALIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDALIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2007