Abdalla, Mohamed Ali Abdulrehman (CPSO#: 88196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Nov 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Swahili

Education:University of Nairobi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg District Memorial
Hospital
Department of Medicine
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone: (519) 842-3611
Fax: (519) 842-6733
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohamed A. A. Abdalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdalla ( CPSO# 88196 )

Business Address:
Tillsonburg District Memorial
Hospital
Department of Medicine
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Mohamed  Ali  Abdulrehman  Abdalla  may practise medicine independently in
            Internal Medicine, only.