Abdallah, Amel (CPSO#: 78481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Faculte De Medecine De Monastir, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fort William Family Health Team
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1201
Fax: (807) 622-2541
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amel Abdallah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abdallah ( CPSO# 78481 )

Business Address:
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 626-1223

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMEL ABDALLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDALLAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2002 to 20 Sep 2002
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 16 Dec 2002 to 13 Jan 2003
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2003