Abdel Hadi, Farid Mostafa (CPSO#: 85555)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1006
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C4
Phone: (905) 245-0711
Fax: (905) 245-0522
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2 Champagne Drive: East Entrance
Toronto ON  M3J 0K2
Canada
Phone: 416-222-6160
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

108-7100 Woodbine Ave
Markham ON  L3R 5J2
Canada
Phone: 9056047976
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

7095 Woodbine Ave
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: 9054795511
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Lakeridge Health
The Oshawa Hospital
1 Hospital Court
Durham ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

IVF Canada
Suite 304
2347 Kennedy Street
Toronto ON  M1T 3T8
Canada
Phone: (416) 754-1010
Fax: (416) 321-1239
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

7191 Yonge Street #1006
Thornhill, ON L3T 0C4
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C4
Canada
Phone: 905-597-7661
Fax: 905-597-7662
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

50 Absolute Ave
Mississauga ON  L4Z 0B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 897-0772
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

238 Main St E,
Milton ON  L9T 1N8
Canada
Phone: 905- 864-0000
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

80 Glen Shields Ave #5
Concord ON  L4K 1T7
Canada
Phone: (905) 669-0306
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

9080 Yonge Street
Level 2, Unit 12
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: 289-597-7675
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

80 Finch West
North York Cosmetic Clinmic
North York ON  M2N 2H4
Canada
Phone: 647-358-9622
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdel Hadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Abdel Hadi ( CPSO# 85555 )

Business Address:
304 - 2347 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 3T8
Phone Number: (416) 754-1010

Business Address:
Suite 16
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (905) 245-0711

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARID MOSTAFA ABDEL HADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL HADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2006 to 06 Nov 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 07 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008