Abdel Hameed, Arwa Abdel Hameed Nabhan (CPSO#: 81582)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 05 May 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2006