Abdel Meguid, Abdel Meguid Kamel (CPSO#: 95015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Streetsville Glen Medical Centre
Unit 1B
7955 Financial Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 0J8
Phone: (905) 455-8877
Fax: (905) 455-8867
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.K.Abdel Meguid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abdel Meguid ( CPSO# 95015 )

Business Address:
Streetsville Glen Medical Centre
Unit 1B
7955 Financial Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 0J8
Phone Number: (905) 455-8877

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDEL MEGUID KAMEL ABDEL MEGUID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL MEGUID is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2012

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: March 21, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)