Abdel Rahman, Ahmed Basem Sayed Ahmed (CPSO#: 77271)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 02 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005