Abdel-Malak, Mamdouh Zaki (CPSO#: 61325)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mamdouh Abdel-Malak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 101 North Syndicate Ave Thunder Bay, ON P7C 3V4
Date Received: 09 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 10 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1995
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 27, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mamdouh Zaki Abdel-Malak to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 27, 2018:

Dr. Abdel-Malak is required to complete a specified continuing education program (‘SCERP”) in medical record keeping and a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”) in the management of ureteral injuries and post-operative monitoring of patients.

Dr. Abdel- Malak has ceased to practice medicine in Ontario. The SCERPS are incomplete. Dr. Abdel Malak will be required to complete the SCERPS if and when he returns to practice in Ontario.