Abdel-Malik Ghali, Rafik Ramzy (CPSO#: 89356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 May 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 205
477 King Street
Welland ON  L3B 3K4
Phone: (905) 732-6660
Fax: (905) 732-6669
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 fourth Ave St
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 9053784647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abdel-Malik Ghali ( CPSO# 89356 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Business Address:
Unit 205
477 King Street
Welland ON  L3B 3K4
Phone Number: (905) 732-6660

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 May 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 05 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 30 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 31 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 31 Jan 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 31 Jan 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from January 31, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Rafik Ramzy
            Abdel-Malik Ghali, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Abdel-Malik Ghali to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:
            [Note: To obtain a copy of Schedules A, B, C of this Undertaking, contact the
            College's Membership Services Department at 416 967 2673 or
            membership@cpso.on.ca]

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. RAFIK RAMZY ABDEL-MALIK GHALI
                                    ("Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                                                                                     
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, certificate of registration number 89356, am a
                  member of the College.  The College has received information regarding my
                  standard of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that I entered into an Undertaking
                  with the College on September 9, 2016 (the "September 9, 2016
                  Undertaking").  Pursuant to the September 9, 2016 Undertaking, I agreed
                  to restrict my practice and further agreed to undergo a remediation
                  program as set out in Appendix "A" of the September 9, 2016 (the
                  "Remediation Program").  I confirm that I have completed the Remediation
                  Program set out in Appendix "A" of the September 9, 2016.  I understand
                  that this Undertaking replaces and supercedes the September 9, 2016
                  Undertaking.

            (4)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that I entered into a further
                  Undertaking with the College on November 7, 2017 (the "November 7, 2017
                  Undertaking").  Pursuant to the November 7, 2017 Undertaking, I agreed to
                  restrict my practice to surgical assisting and office consultations with
                  patients who were already under my care and required follow up.  I
                  understand that this Undertaking replaces and supercedes the November 7,
                  2017 Undertaking.

            (5)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that I currently have hospital
                  privileges only at the Niagara Health System ("NHS"), which is a
                  multi-site public hospital, and at Humber River Hospital, where I
                  practice as a surgical assistant.  

            (6)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that I entered into a return to
                  work agreement with the NHS, executed on January 30, 2018 ("Return to
                  Work Agreement"), and that the Return to Work Agreement imposes a number
                  of conditions on my privileges at NHS.  I further acknowledge that I
                  entered into three (3) mentorship agreements between myself, NHS and Drs.
                  Simunovic, Faidi and Sne, respectively, ("Mentor Agreements") all of
                  which were executed on or before January 30, 2018.  Copies of these four
                  (4) agreements are attached hereto at Schedule "A".

            (7)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that this Undertaking is to be read
                  in conjunction with the Return to Work Agreement and the Mentor
                  Agreements and does not supersede or replace the Return to Work Agreement
                  and the Mentor Agreements. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (8)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, understand and agree that I am bound by this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.  I further acknowledge and
                  agree that this Undertaking will be in effect until the College has been
                  advised of and has approved any changes to my privileges at NHS that
                  occurs upon completion of all components of the Return to Work Agreement
                  and the Mentor Agreements. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, undertake that I will abide by the terms and
                  conditions as set out in the Return to Work Agreement and the Mentor
                  Agreements attached hereto at Schedule "A". 

            (10)  Practice Restrictions  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, undertake that I will not perform and/or
                        engage in any surgical procedures at any health care facility other
                        than the St. Catharines site of the NHS for as long as this
                        Undertaking remains in force. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, undertake that the entirety of my
                        surgical scope of practice will be limited in the following ways:
                  
                        (i)   I will perform endoscopies one day (totalling six (6) hours)
                              per week;
                  
                        (ii)  I will perform elective procedures in the operating room one
                              day (totalling seven (7) hours) per week; 
                              a.    For greater clarity, elective procedures will be
                                    limited to the following:
                                    i.    Cholecystectomy, hernias, routine colon cancer,
                                          bowel resections, appendectomies, breast surgery,
                                          minor procedures, endoscopy and colonoscopy;
                  
                        (iii) I will perform minor procedures at NHS totalling four (4)
                              hours per month for the duration of this Undertaking; 
                  
                              a.    Minor procedures are defined in paragraph 10 of the
                                    Return to Work Agreement and include: 
                                    i.    The excision of small skin and subcutaneous
                                          lesions, local anorectal procedures, and the
                                          management/ debridement of complicated wounds;
                  
                        (iv)  I will perform procedures from the elective lists only and
                              will not have any on-call shifts.
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, undertake that I will not commence practice at
                  any location other than the St. Catharines site of NHS without prior
                  approval of the College.  

            (12)  Procedure Log

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, shall keep a log of all elective surgical
                        procedures that I propose to perform, including all procedures that
                        are approved by my mentors and all procedures that are rejected or
                        revised by my mentors ("Procedure Log").  The Procedure Log will
                        include at least the following information:  
                  
                        (i)   the date when I proposed the surgery to the patient;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient with chart / file number;
                        (iii) the specific type of procedure that I propose;
                        (iv)  the recommended time/date for performing the procedure;
                        (v)   the date that the proposed procedure was reviewed by a
                              mentor;
                        (vi)  the outcome of the mentor's review; and 
                        (vii) the mentor's initials.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, undertake to provide the College with the
                        Procedure Log or access to the Procedure Log upon request.
                  
            (13)  Mentorship Program

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, undertake to participate in a mentorship
                        program and to practise under the guidance of a mentor committee
                        whose members are acceptable to the College (the "Mentors"), for at
                        least six (6) months, with respect to my performance of
                        endoscopies, elective procedures and minor procedures at NHS
                        ("Mentorship Program"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that I have reviewed the
                        Mentor Agreements which are attached hereto at Schedule "A" of this
                        Undertaking, and understand what is required of the Mentors.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, undertake to abide by any and all terms
                        of the Mentor Agreements in order to facilitate the Mentorship
                        Program, and agree that the Mentors will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Review, on a weekly basis, each and every elective surgery I
                              propose to perform.  The Mentors' assessment will be based on
                              a written summary that I provide for each proposed surgery,
                              which shall include the indications for surgery, plan of
                              action and plan for post-operative care.  After reviewing the
                              written summaries for each proposed surgery, the Mentors will
                              either approve the plan or make recommendations for changes;
                  
                        (ii)  Select and review, on a weekly basis, the complete patient
                              chart for one in five of the proposed elective surgeries;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me in person, at least on a monthly basis, to
                              discuss my performance of all aspects of the Mentorship
                              Program;
                  
                        (iv)  Participate in monthly teleconferences with the NHS Chief of
                              Staff and Chief of Surgery to report on their observations
                              and feedback on the pre-scheduling discussions and random
                              chart review; 
                  
                        (v)   Participate in two (2) additional teleconferences, to occur
                              prior to Dr. Simunovic's reviews at three (3) months and
                              again at six (6) months of the Mentorship Program;
                  
                        (vi)  Review any cases identified by the NHS as having
                              complications or identified by NHS' "IRS" system; and
                  
                        (vii) Report immediately to NHS, if the Mentors have any concerns
                              regarding my care or conduct.
                  
            (14)  Coaching/Supervision Program

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, undertake to participate in monthly
                        coaching sessions with Dr. Simunovic regarding my return to work at
                        NHS and any challenges associated with my return to work for at
                        least six (6) months.  I further undertake to participate in
                        bi-monthly coaching sessions with Dr. Simunovic for an additional
                        six (6) months, for a total of one (1) year. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that upon request by Dr.
                        Simunovic or NHS, the frequency of these coaching sessions can be
                        increased. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, undertake to submit to and cooperate with
                        a quarterly review of my surgical practise by Dr. Simunovic for at
                        least six (6) months ("Supervision Program"). 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that I have reviewed Dr.
                        Simunovic's Mentor Agreement which is attached as Schedule "A" to
                        this Undertaking, and understand what is required of Dr. Simunovic.
                        Under the Supervision Program, Dr. Simunovic will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Conduct regular coaching sessions with me regarding my return
                              to work and any challenges associated with my return to work;

                        (ii)  After three (3) months and after six (6) months of the
                              Mentorship Program, review a random selection of twenty (20)
                              cases comprised of fifteen (15) surgical cases, three (3)
                              endoscopic procedures and two (2) small outpatient
                              procedures;
                  
                        (iii) Review any cases identified by the NHS as having
                              complications or identified by NHS' "IRS" system; 
                  
                        (iv)  Attend and observe in person, on a monthly basis, my
                              performance of endoscopies and/or elective surgeries for one
                              half day;
                  
                        (v)   Participate in two (2) teleconferences with the Mentors and
                              NHS, to occur prior to Dr. Simunovic's review at three (3)
                              months and again at six (6) months;  and
                  
                        (vi)  Report immediately to NHS, if Dr. Simunovic has any concerns
                              regarding my care or conduct.
                  
            (15)  Reports from Chief of Staff

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, undertake to have Dr. Thomas Stewart or
                        another Chief of Staff at NHS assist the College in the monitoring
                        of my practice. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that I have reviewed the
                        undertaking of the Chief of Staff attached hereto as Schedule "B",
                        and understand what is required of the Chief of Staff, including
                        conducting a monthly teleconference with the College regarding my
                        progress under and compliance with the Return to Work Agreement and
                        the Mentor Agreements.  
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that the Chief of Staff shall
                        report to the College immediately if she/he is concerned that my
                        practice may fall below the standard of practice of the profession,
                        that I may not be in compliance with the provisions of the Return
                        to Work Agreement or the Mentor Agreements and/or this Undertaking
                        with the College, and/or that my patients may be exposed to risk of
                        harm or injury.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that the Chief of Staff shall
                        also report to the College if any of the Mentors have reported
                        concerns regarding my standard of care or conduct, and the nature
                        of those concerns.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, undertake to ensure that Schedule "B", to
                        this Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within ten
                        (10) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my practice at NHS or
                        any location where I conduct office consultations with patients, by
                        a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, give my irrevocable consent to the
                        College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who
                        or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP
                        consent form, attached hereto as Schedule "C".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be
                  solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses,
                  etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (19)  I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (20)  I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Mentors, coaches, supervisors and any Chief of Staff,
                  or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any location where I
                  practice ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (21)  I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that a breach by me of any
                  provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional
                  misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified
                  allegations to the Discipline Committee.

            (22)  I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (23)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that, during the time period
                        that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (23)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali may only engage in or perform surgical
                              procedures, including endoscopies, at the St. Catharines site
                              of the Niagara Health System.  He may not work any on-call
                              shifts and shall be restricted to one day of endoscopies per
                              week, one day of elective procedures per week and four hours
                              of minor procedures per month.  Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali shall
                              practice under the guidance of a mentor committee and a
                              supervisor.    
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (24)  I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide all Mentors, coaches, supervisors and all Chiefs of Staff with
                  any of the following: 

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking; 
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (25)  I, Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali, give my irrevocable consent to all Mentors,
                  coaches, supervisors and all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, all information relevant to this Undertaking and/or
                  relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 31, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Rafik Ramzy Abdel-Malik Ghali to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 31, 2018:

Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali may only engage in or perform surgical procedures, including endoscopies, at the St. Catharines site of the Niagara Health System. He may not work any on-call shifts and shall be restricted to one day of endoscopies per week, one day of elective procedures per week and four hours of minor procedures per month. Dr. Abdel-Malik Ghali shall practice under the guidance of a mentor committee and a supervisor.