Abdelgader, Abdelgalel G (CPSO#: 76913)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 20
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 735-5050
Fax: (519) 735-5501
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Abdelgader Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abdelgader ( CPSO# 76913 )

Business Address:
20 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 735-5050

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 352-6401

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 04 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDELGALEL G ABDELGADER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELGADER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 29 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2002 to 29 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2003 to 29 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2004 to 29 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2007