Abdelgadir, Ibrahim Mohamed Ali (CPSO#: 80776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Garyounis University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Marha's Regional Hospital
Suite 124
23 Bay Street
Antigonish NS  B2G 2G7
Phone: (902) 863-4053

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IBRAHIM MOHAMED ALI ABDELGADIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELGADIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2004 to 05 Jul 2004
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 05 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jul 2005 to 05 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 05 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2017