Abdul Aziz, Ayman As'ad Moh'd (CPSO#: 96500)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Jordan, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015