Abdul Wahab, Muzafar Gani (CPSO#: 93346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jan 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Madurai Kamaraj University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Division of Neonatal Medicine
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73689
Fax: (905) 521-5007
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.G. Abdul Wahab Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdul Wahab ( CPSO# 93346 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Division of Neonatal Medicine
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Muzafar Gani Abdul Wahab may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  Division  of   Neonatology,  McMaster  University, in
                        which Dr. Abdul Wahab holds an academic appointment at  the rank of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  automatically expires when Dr.  Abdul
                  Wahab no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.