Abdulla, Karim Ramzan (CPSO#: 95899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 2900
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Gastrointestinal Institute
1910 St Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 686-6656
Fax: (613) 248-9009
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karim Abdulla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Abdulla ( CPSO# 95899 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
1910 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 686-6656

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Aug 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARIM RAMZAN ABDULLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2016