Abdullah, Mona Yousef Qumber M H (CPSO#: 77123)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 15 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Apr 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2006 to 30 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Mar 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2010