Abdullah, Rukhsana Asif (CPSO#: 92285)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Hospital, THP
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7580
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 4A
128 Queen Street South
Mississauga ON  L5M 1K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 997-7712
Fax: (905) 997-7714
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. A. Abdullah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abdullah ( CPSO# 92285 )

Business Address:
4A - 128 Queen Street South
Mississauga ON  L5M 1K8
Phone Number: (905) 997-7712

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUKHSANA ASIF ABDULLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULLAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Nov 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010