Abdulrehman, Jameel (CPSO#: 95789)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3111
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMEEL ABDULREHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULREHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Oct 2015 to 22 Nov 2015
Elective Trainee - Transfusion Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Sep 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2016