Abdurahman, Adel Abduselam (CPSO#: 81430)

Current Status: Suspended as of 19 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adel Abdurahman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2018
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 15 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2018

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 19 Sep 2018


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2018 Active

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Feb 2018
Summary:

On February 9, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Adel Abduselam Abdurahman 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to 
the practice of medicine that having regard to all the circumstances would reasonably be regarded by 
members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Abdurahman is a general surgeon practising medicine in Sault Ste Marie, Ontario. He received his 
medical degree in Ontario in 2004 and his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice 
and specialist qualification in general surgery in Ontario in 2009. 
 
Alternative Payment Plan (“the Agreement”) 
 
Effective in 2005, the Ministry of Health and Long-Term Care entered into an Alternative Payment 
Plan (“the Agreement”) with physicians, local hospitals and the Ontario Medical Association for 
funding of general surgery services in the district of Kenora and Rainy River. One of the goals of the 
Agreement is to provide surgical services in the under-serviced regions of northern Ontario. The 
physicians are members in a group known as the Regional Surgical Network, (“the Group”) and are 
required to sign a declaration and consent confirming that they are bound by the Agreement. Under the 
terms of the Agreement, a physician member of the Group receives an annual payment in return for 
providing surgical services in one of the hospitals named in the Agreement. The Agreement 
specifically prohibits physicians who are members of the Group from submitting claims or accepting 
payment from the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”).   
 
Disgraceful, Dishonourable or Unprofessional Conduct 
 
In September 2014, Dr. Abdurahman was appointed as one of two General Surgeons to Riverside 
Health Care Facilities, La Verendrye Hospital, in Fort Frances, Ontario (Fort Frances Hospital), with 
courtesy privileges at the Emo and Rainy River Health Centres – the hospitals covered by the 
Agreement. On January 1, 2015, Dr. Abdurahman signed declaration and consent forms, confirming 
that he is a member of the Group and is bound by the terms of the Agreement. Between January 1, 
2015 and October 6, 2016, Dr. Abdurahman was providing general surgery services at Fort Frances 
Hospital under the terms the Agreement, pursuant to which he received lump sum payment in 
exchange for providing general surgery services and was specifically prohibited from submitting 
claims or accepting payment from the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”).  
 
During the time he held privileges with Fort Frances Hospital, Dr. Abdurahman held privileges at five 
other hospitals in Ontario, which are outside the service area covered by the Agreement and are 
located within 950-2000km from Fort Frances Hospital.  
 
In October 2016, the College received information from Fort Frances Hospital that Dr. Abdurahman 
had breached the terms of the Agreement by: 
 
 - practising outside the geographic area covered by the Agreement; 
 - billing OHIP for services provided, contrary to the terms of the Agreement, on a fee-for –service 
  basis; and 
 - providing locum coverage and services at hospitals up to 2000 km away from Fort Frances Hospital 
  at the same time that he was paid to be first General Surgeon on-call at the Fort Frances Hospital. 
Specifically, during the period that he was bound by the Agreement, Dr. Abdurahman: 
 
-  submitted claims for services provided and accepted payment from OHIP in the amount of $204, 
   959.74, in violation of the agreement;  
-  rendered and billed for services at hospitals that are not parties to the agreement and are between 
   1000 to 2000 km away from Fort Frances on thirty-three (33) dates. On at least thirty (30) of these 
   dates, he was also first General Surgeon on-call at Fort Frances Hospital and it was physically 
   impossible for him to attend at Fort Frances Hospital within any reasonable time period; 
-  on the same dates when he was being paid to be on-call at Fort Frances Hospital, he submitted 
   claims and received payment from OHIP in the amount of $37, 827.34 for services rendered at 
   other hospitals, an amount included in the total amount of $204, 959.74, referred to above; 
-  used vacation days from Fort Frances to provide fee-for-service coverage, and submit claims to 
   OHIP, at hospitals in Ontario not party to the agreement;   
-  upon learning that Fort Frances Hospital had received information that he was providing services 
   and billing OHIP outside the terms of the agreement, Dr. Abdurahman provided inaccurate 
   information to Fort Frances Hospital regarding the number of dates he was providing services at 
   other hospitals. He also contacted the Chief of Staff of Fort Frances Hospital to ask him to 
   retroactively falsify the Fort Frances Hospital on-call schedule so that the schedule would not 
   reflect conflicts when Dr. Abdurahman was in fact providing services elsewhere.  
    
Resignation and Repayment Plan 
 
Dr. Abdurahman resigned his privileges with Riverside Health Care on October 6, 2016, and is no 
longer a member of the Group. Dr. Abdurahman entered into a promissory note, dated October 27, 
2016, in the amount of $46,944.87, payable to the Group in four instalments. The promissory note 
reflects  money  the  Group  owes  to  the Ministry  of  Health  and  Long-Term  Care as  a  result  of  Dr. 
Abdurahman’s breach of the Agreement. The amount of $46,944.87 is comprised of the amount paid 
to Dr. Abdurahman for being the first General Surgeon on-call at Fort Frances on dates when he was 
also billing OHIP for services rendered in other hospitals, as well as a recruitment bonus he was paid 
to work in Fort Frances and to which he was no longer entitled due to his breach of the Agreement.  
 
Under the terms of the promissory note, Dr. Abdurahman was scheduled to pay the entire amount by 
March 17, 2017. To date, Dr. Abdurahman has repaid $6,000.00. 
 
Disposition 
 
On August 13, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
   -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Abdurahman’s Certificate of Registration for a nine (9) month 
      period, effective immediately. 
   -  Dr. Abdurahman appear before the panel to be reprimanded within three (3) months of the date 
      this Order becomes final. 
   -  The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Abdurahman’s 
      Certificate of Registration, effective immediately: 
      
-  Dr. Abdurahman will successfully complete the PROBE course in ethics and 
   professionalism, at his own expense, within 6 months of the date of this Order, or any 
   alternate course in ethics and professionalism approved by the College. Dr. 
   Abdurahman will agree to abide by any recommendations of the PROBE program and 
   provide proof of completion to the College; 
-  Prior to resuming practice after the period of suspension of his certificate of 
   registration. Dr. Abdurahman shall retain a College-approved clinical supervisor, who 
   will sign an undertaking in the form attached as Schedule "A" to the Order (the 
   "Clinical Supervisor"), to review Dr. Abdurahman's Ontario Health Insurance 
   Plan(OHIP) claims and billings, any other billing submitted to or paid out by the 
   Ministry of Health and Long-Term Care (MOHLTC) and the corresponding patient 
   records; 
-  For a period of five (5)years, Dr. Abdurahman may practice only under the 
   supervision of the Clinical Supervisor and will abide by all recommendations of his 
   Clinical Supervisor with respect to his practice, including but not limited to review of 
   OHIP billings and corresponding patient charts, and may also include practice 
   management, and continuing education. The period of Clinical Supervision will 
   commence on the expiry of the period of suspension, or on the date that the Clinical 
   Supervisor is approved, if one is not approved during the period of suspension; 
-  The Clinical Supervisor will conduct the review once every month and the review will 
   consist of at least twenty (20) patient charts, selected in the sole discretion of the 
   Clinical Supervisor, and the corresponding claims and billings submitted to OHIP 
   and/or the MOHLTC; 
-  The Clinical Supervisor will provide a report to the College once every month, or 
   more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about Dr. Abdurahman's 
   standard of practice or conduct. 
-  If, prior to completion of Clinical Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor is unable or 
   unwilling to continue in that role for any reason. Dr. Abdurahman shall retain a new 
   College-approved Clinical Supervisor who will sign an undertaking in the form 
   attached hereto as Schedule "A". If Dr. Abdurahman fails to retain a Clinical 
   Supervisor on the terms set out above within thirty (30) days of receiving notification 
   that his former Clinical Supervisor is unable or unwilling to continue in that role, he 
   shall cease practicing medicine until such time as he has obtained a Clinical 
   Supervisor acceptable to the College. If Dr. Abdurahman is required to cease practice 
   as a result of this paragraph, this will constitute a term, condition and limitation on his 
   certificate of registration and such term, condition and limitation shall be included on 
   the public register; 
-  After a minimum period of one year of Clinical Supervision, and only upon receipt of 
   approval from the College, the frequency of supervision may be reduced from time to 
   time thereafter as recommended by the Clinical Supervisor and only as approved by 
   the College; 
-  Upon completion of the five (5) year period of Clinical Supervision, as described 
   above, within approximately six (6) months. Dr. Abdurahman shall undergo a re-
   assessment of his practice by a College-appointed assessor (the "Assessor"). This re-
   assessment by the Assessor will include a review of Dr. Abdurahman's office charts 
   and corresponding OHIP billings and an interview with Dr. Abdurahman. Dr. 
             Abdurahman shall abide by all recommendations made by the College-appointed 
             Assessor. The Assessor shall report the results of this re-assessment to the College; 
          -  Dr. Abdurahman shall inform the College of each and every location where he 
             practises, in any jurisdiction (his "Practice Location(s)") within fifteen (15) days of 
             this Order and shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within 
             fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location; 
          -  Dr. Abdurahman shall consent to the sharing of information between the Clinical 
             Supervisor, Assessor and the College as any of them deem necessary or desirable in 
             order to fulfill their respective obligations; 
          -  Dr. Abdurahman shall consent to the monitoring of his OHIP billings and cooperate 
             with inspections of his practice and patient charts by the Clinical Supervisor and 
             College representatives for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance 
             with this term of the Order. Monitoring this term shall include making enquiries of the 
             Ministry of Health and Long- Term Care regarding Dr. Abdurahman's billings; 
          -  Dr. Abdurahman shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his office practice 
             and patient charts by the College for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his 
             compliance with the terms of this Order and shall provide his irrevocable consent to 
             the College to make appropriate enquiries of any person or institution who may have 
             relevant information for the purposes of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with 
             the terms of this Order; and 
          -  Dr. Abdurahman shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with 
             implementing the terms of this Order. 
      
   -  Dr. Abdurahman shall, within three (3) months, pay a fine to the Minister of Finance in the 
      amount  of  $35,000.00,  and  Dr.  Abdurahman  shall  provide  proof  of  this  payment  to  the 
      Registrar of the College. 
   -  Dr. Abdurahman pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $5,500 within 
      thirty (30) days from the date this Order becomes final. 
 
Appeal 
 
On August 15, 2018, Dr. Abdurahman appealed the penalty decision of the Discipline Committee to the 
Divisional Court. Pursuant to the terms of Dr. Abdurahman’s undertaking to the College of July 4, 
2017, the decision of the Discipline Committee remains in effect despite the appeal. 
 
On October 16, 2018, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Abdurahman’s appeal for delay, with costs 
fixed at $750.00.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 9, 2018