Abdurrahman, Mariam Bolade (CPSO#: 88381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416 530 6591
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdurrahman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdurrahman ( CPSO# 88381 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6591

Business Address:
900 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIAM BOLADE ABDURRAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDURRAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2014