Abdurrahman, Zainab Bukola (CPSO#: 86703)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
505 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1B1
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: (416) 848-7664
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 111
2680 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P4Y4
Canada
Phone: 416 755 2241
Fax: 416 755 8413
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3rd Floor
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

HSC Room 3A
Department of Pediatrics
McMaster University
1280 Main Street
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 77577
Fax: (905) 524-5707
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z.B. Abdurrahman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Abdurrahman ( CPSO# 86703 )

Business Address:
Kindercare Pediatrics
505 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 103
Toronto ON  M5N 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 848-7665

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Room 3A
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
111 - 2680 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 4Y4
Phone Number: (416) 755-2241

Business Address:
Albany Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 20 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAINAB BUKOLA ABDURRAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDURRAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011