Abedi, Syed Morteza (CPSO#: 96214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Sint Eustatius, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Rouge Hospital
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 416 284 8131
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.M. Abedi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abedi ( CPSO# 96214 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Rouge Hospital
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 03 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYED MORTEZA ABEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABEDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2017