Abenstein, Dana (CPSO#: 95862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Levit, Dana (used until: 05 Dec 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Family Physicians
Suite 101
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dana Abenstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Abenstein ( CPSO# 95862 )

Business Address:
Markham Family Physicians
Suite 101
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANA ABENSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABENSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013