Abhayambika, Archana (CPSO#: 86525)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Kerala, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 24 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010