Abidi, Rabbiya Nasir (CPSO#: 89843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pushto, Sindhi, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ministry of Health
Al Murabah, Riyadh
Riyadh 27560
Saudi Arabia
Phone: 966526741360
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rabbiya Nasir Abidi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 23 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia
USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RABBIYA NASIR ABIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABIDI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2009