Abo Aisha, Sanaa Mohamed Ibrahim Seleem (CPSO#: 91205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2710 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3X5
Phone: (519) 915-3189
Fax: (519) 915-3473
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Abo Aisha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abo Aisha ( CPSO# 91205 )

Business Address:
2710 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3X5
Phone Number: (519) 915-3189

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANAA MOHAMED IBRAHIM SELEEM ABO AISHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABO AISHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2013