Abohweyere, Anierhe Erhiavwe Joan (CPSO#: 92921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Department of Paediatrics
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 2645
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Whitby Paediatric Associates
Dundas-Centre Medical
Suite 306
220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Canada
Phone: (905) 665-9001
Fax: (905) 665-9335
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anierhe E. Joan Abohweyere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abohweyere ( CPSO# 92921 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Department of Paediatrics
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Dundas Medical Centre
Suite 306
220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone Number: (905) 665-9001

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIERHE ERHIAVWE JOAN ABOHWEYERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOHWEYERE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2015