Abonowara, Abdulgani Ab M (CPSO#: 97498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
282 Linwell Road
St Catharines ON  L2N 6N5
Phone: (905) 646-5557
Fax: (905) 646-5559
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abonowara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abonowara ( CPSO# 97498 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
204 - 282 Linwell Road
St Catharines ON  L2N 6N5
Phone Number: (905) 646-5557


Corporation Name: Elkout Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Elkout ( CPSO# 97507 )
Dr. A. Abonowara ( CPSO# 97498 )

Business Address:
2444 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V1
Phone Number: (905) 566-1414

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULGANI AB M ABONOWARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABONOWARA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2012