Abou Reslan, Walid Fadlalah (CPSO#: 74450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:American University of Beirut, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
23546 Woodbine Avenue
Keswick ON  L4P 0E2
Phone: 905 989 0911
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Abou Reslan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Abou Reslan ( CPSO# 74450 )

Business Address:
23546 Woodbine Avenue
Suite E5-7
Georgina ON  L4P 3E9
Phone Number: (905) 989-0911

Business Address:
121 - 1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone Number: (416) 701-1222

Business Address:
302 - 328 Highway 7
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P7
Phone Number: (905) 731-4001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 Apr 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALID FADLALAH ABOU RESLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOU RESLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 29 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2010