Abou-Nassar, Karim Etienne (CPSO#: 79612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
suite 200
430 boul de l'Hôpital
Gatineau QC  J8V 1T7
Phone: (819) 568-3030
Fax: (819) 568-2828
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

713 Montreal road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: 613-746-4621 Ext. 2716
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARIM ETIENNE ABOU-NASSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOU-NASSAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 10 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 11 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 25 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010