Abouammoh, Marwan Abdulrahman M (CPSO#: 92359)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2010 to 22 Feb 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 23 Feb 2010 to 04 Jan 2011
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jan 2011