Abouchacra, Samra (CPSO#: 56713)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Al Ain Hospital
Tawam Hospital
Al Ain,, AbuDhabi, UAE
Al-Ain 1006 Abu Dhabi 1006
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 97150 4484796
Fax: 97137022166

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 03 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMRA ABOUCHACRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOUCHACRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 6 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1987