Abounaja, Mohamed Asadig (CPSO#: 89997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Jan 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
2100 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Phone: (416) 690-3533
Fax: 888-630-9203
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Health System Ajax
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Chronic Pain Management Clinic
Unit 425
1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-7080
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Abounaja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 17 2010


Corporation Name: Alazhari Abounaja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 19 2018


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Abounaja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abounaja ( CPSO# 89997 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9

Business Address:
Suite 106
2100 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1H 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 797-6577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 13 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 15 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 3) As from June 15, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition
            and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mohamed Asadig
            Abounaja, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Abounaja
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. MOHAMED ASADIG ABOUNAJA
                                          ("Dr. Abounaja")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICRC" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the
                  College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Abounaja, certificate of registration number 89997, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215094 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct or am incompetent in my family medicine
                  practice, including my pain management practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not resolve the
                  Investigation or in any way preclude the College from taking any action
                  in respect of the Investigation. This Undertaking is an interim measure
                  to seek to ensure the protection of the public while the Investigation is
                  ongoing.

            (5)   I, Dr. Abounaja, understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of
                  this Undertaking from the date on which I sign it until the ICRC disposes
                  of the Investigation. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (6)   I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (7)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake that I will not administer sciatic nerve
                        blocks, except under the direct observation of a medical inspector
                        or assessor appointed by the College.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (14)  I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Abounaja is the subject of a College investigation into
                              his family practice, including his pain management practice.
                              Until the investigation is resolved, Dr. Abounaja has
                              undertaken that he will not administer sciatic nerve blocks,
                              except under the direct observation of a medical inspector or
                              assessor appointed by the College of Physicians and Surgeons
                              of Ontario. Further information may be found on the College
                              of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                              www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.



            (2 of 3) As from October 31, 2016, the following is imposed as a term,
            condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mohamed
            Asadig Abounaja, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Abounaja to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. MOHAMED ASADIG ABOUNAJA
                                          ("Dr.Abounaja)
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Abounaja, certificate of registration number 89997, am a member of
                  the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (2)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that I entered into an undertaking with the
                  College on September 19, 2016, a copy of which is attached hereto as
                  Appendix "A" (the "September 19 2016 Undertaking").

            (3)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that this Undertaking is supplemental to the
                  September 19,2016 Undertaking and unless explicitly stated below, this
                  Undertaking does not supersede or replace the September 19, 2016
                  Undertaking, rather, this Undertaking is to be read in conjunction with
                  it. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that in accordance with the September 19,
                  2016 Undertaking, I am restricted to practicing emergency medicine at
                  Rouge Valley Hospitals Ajax (580 Harwood Avenue South, Ajax) and
                  Centenary Sites (2867 Ellesmere Road, Toronto).

            (5)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that effective November 1, 2016, the Rouge
                  Valley Ajax site, located at 580 Harwood Avenue South, Ajax, will be
                  taken over by Lakeridge Health Corporation, and will be referred to as
                  Lakeridge Health.

            (6)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that effective November 1, 2016, the Rouge
                  Valley Centenary site, located at 2867 Ellesmere Road, Toronto, will
                  merge with the Scarborough Hospital, and will be referred to as
                  Scarborough-Rouge Hospital.

            (7)   I, Dr, Abounaja, acknowledge that after November 1, 2016, my practice
                  will continue to be restricted to two sites: 580 Harwood Avenue South,
                  Ajax, which shall be known as Lakeridge Health and 2867 Ellesmere Road,
                  Toronto, which shall be known as Scarborough-Rouge Hospital.

            (8)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (9)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that after November 1, 2016, the following
                  summary will appear on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect.  I
                  further acknowledge that the following summary will replace the summary
                  set out in paragraph 16 of the September 19 2016 Undertaking:

                        Dr. Abounaja was the subject of a reassessment by the College. As a
                        result of the reassessment:
                  
                        *     Dr.  Abounaja will  limit  his  Emergency Department  shifts
                              to  a maximum of 6 hours per day, and a maximum of 90 hours
                              per month;
                        *     Dr. Abounaja will only work in the Emergency Department when
                              there is another emergency physician on site for the entire
                              duration of his shift;
                        *     Dr. Abounaja will ensure that at the time of suspected
                              diagnosis of any of the following: significantly abnormal
                              vital signs, sepsis, severe sepsis or septic shock, another
                              emergency physician on site reviews his care of these
                              patients;
                        *     Dr. Abounaja will restrict his practice of Emergency Medicine
                              to 580 Harwood  Avenue  South,  Ajax  (Lakeridge  Health)
                              and  2867 Ellesmere Road, Toronto (Scarborough-Rouge
                              Hospital); 
                        *     Dr.  Abounaja  will  practise  under  the  guidance  of  a
                              Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months;
                        *     Dr. Abounaja's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College following the end of the period of
                              Clinical Supervision.
                  
            A.    CONSENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (3 of 3) As from September 19, 2016, the following terms, conditions and
            limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mohamed
            Asadig Abounaja, in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Abounaja has
            provided to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                      DR. MOHAMED ASADIG ABOUNAJA
                                           ("Dr. Abounaja")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Abounaja, certificate of registration number 89997, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that my practice was the subject of a
                  reassessment by the College. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that on January 13, 2014, I executed an
                  undertaking with the College (the "January 13, 2014 Undertaking"). I
                  acknowledge that I subsequently executed an undertaking on November 25,
                  2014 (the "November 25, 2014 Undertaking"), which included an amendment
                  to the January 13, 2014 Undertaking.  I acknowledge that this Undertaking
                  as signed by me, replaces the January 13, 2014 and November 25, 2014
                  Undertakings,  and the January 13, 2014 and November 25, 2014
                  Undertakings are no longer in effect. 


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it. 

            (6)   Practice Restrictions 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall:
                  
                        (i)   limit my Emergency Department shifts to a maximum of 6 hours
                              per day, and a maximum of 90 hours per month;
                        (ii)  only work in the Emergency Department when there is another
                              emergency physician on site for the entire duration of my
                              shift; 
                        (iii) ensure that at the time of suspected diagnosis of any of the
                              following: significantly abnormal vital signs, sepsis, severe
                              sepsis or septic shock, another emergency physician on site
                              reviews my care of these patients; 
                        (iv)  restrict my practice of Emergency Medicine to Rouge Valley
                              Centenary Hospital Ajax and Centenary Sites.
                  
            (7)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for at least six (6) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts once every
                              month, in addition to all charts where there were
                              significantly abnormal vital signs and any cases with an
                              admitting diagnosis of sepsis, severe sepsis or septic shock;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me once every month;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report of the Assessor dated April 15, 2016, and concerns that may
                        arise during the period of Clinical Supervision. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Abounaja, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (7)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Abounaja, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (7)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (8)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (8)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the professional education set out in section (8)(a).
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake that following completion of the
                        Clinical Supervision set out in section (7) above and Appendix "A"
                        attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of my practice ("the
                        Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College
                        (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment
                        may include a chart review, direct observation of my care,
                        interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients
                        and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that
                        the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported
                        to the College and the report may form the basis of further action
                        by the College. 
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and
                  acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may
                  constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee
                  of the College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (16)  I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on
                  the College's Register that is available to the public during the time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Abounaja was the subject of a reassessment by the College. As a
                        result of the reassessment:
                  
                  *     Dr. Abounaja will limit his Emergency Department shifts to a
                        maximum of 6 hours per day, and a maximum of 90 hours per month;
                  *     Dr. Abounaja  will only work in the Emergency Department when there
                        is another emergency physician on site for the entire duration of
                        his shift; 
                  *     Dr. Abounaja will ensure that at the time of suspected diagnosis of
                        any of the following: significantly abnormal vital signs, sepsis,
                        severe sepsis or septic shock, another emergency physician on site
                        reviews his care of these patients;
                  *     Dr. Abounaja will restrict his practice of Emergency Medicine to
                        Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital Ajax and Centenary Sites;
                  *     Dr. Abounaja will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                        Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months; 
                  *     Dr. Abounaja's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected
                        by the College following the end of the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education
                  set out in section (8) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to any person who
                  facilitates my completion of the professional education set out in
                  section (8) above, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and
                  Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (8) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: June 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mohamed Asadig Abounaja to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 15, 2017:

Dr. Abounaja is the subject of a College investigation into his family practice, including his pain management practice. Until the investigation is resolved, Dr. Abounaja has undertaken that he will not administer sciatic nerve blocks, except under the direct observation of a medical inspector or assessor appointed by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.


Source: Member
Active Date: October 31, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mohamed Asadig Abounaja to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 31, 2016:

Dr. Abounaja was the subject of a reassessment by the College. As a result of the reassessment:

• Dr. Abounaja will limit his Emergency Department shifts to a maximum of 6 hours per day, and a maximum of 90 hours per month;

• Dr. Abounaja will only work in the Emergency Department when there is another emergency physician on site for the entire duration of his shift;

• Dr. Abounaja will ensure that at the time of suspected diagnosis of any of the following: significantly abnormal vital signs, sepsis, severe sepsis or septic shock, another emergency physician on site reviews his care of these patients;

• Dr. Abounaja will restrict his practice of Emergency Medicine to 580
Harwood Avenue South, Ajax (Lakeridge Health) and 2867 Ellesmere Road, Toronto (Scarborough-Rouge Hospital);

• Dr. Abounaja will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months;

• Dr. Abounaja’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by
the College following the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.