Aboutouk, Dina (CPSO#: 95940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 17886
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hesham Abdelbary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abdelbary ( CPSO# 79341 )
Dr. D. Aboutouk ( CPSO# 95940 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Surgery Orthopaedics
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (647) 893-3176

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 24 Aug 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DINA ABOUTOUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOUTOUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 25 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 24 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 06 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2016