Abraham, Natalia Kannampadathu (CPSO#: 94949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

Expiry Date:  05 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Dept Epidemiology & Community Med
Room 101
600 Peter Morand Crescent
Ottawa ON  K1G 5Z3
Phone: (613) 562-5800 Ext. 8041
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIA KANNAMPADATHU ABRAHAM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ABRAHAM is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. ABRAHAM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ABRAHAM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ABRAHAM shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ABRAHAM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ABRAHAM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 05 Jan 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 12 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 13 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 14 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 05 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jan 2019