Abrahao Junior, Agessandro (CPSO#: 105229)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 2018

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Mar 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
ALS Neuromuscular Clinic
Room UG26
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4213
Fax: (416) 480-6817
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 25 Mar 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 25 Mar 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Agessandro Abrahao Junior may practise medicine only as required by
                  the clinical fellowship program in neurology in which Dr. Abrahao Junior
                  is enrolled in the Department of Neurology, University of Toronto;

            2.    Dr.  Abrahao  Junior  shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients and out-
                  patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                  department where Dr. Abrahao  Junior  is properly practising medicine and
                  to which postgraduate trainees are regularly  assigned  by the department
                  as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

            3.    Dr. Abrahao Junior shall not charge a fee for medical services; and

            4.    The certificate expires on December 31, 2018.