Abrahim, Mohammed (CPSO#: 89838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: Abdolhady, Mohammad Ebrahim (used until: 30 Jan 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone: (905) 876-7606
Fax: (905) 876-7000
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

470 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2J4
Canada
Phone: 905-876-0086
Fax: 905-876-4477
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Abrahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abrahim ( CPSO# 89838 )

Business Address:
13-1525 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 0B2
Phone Number: (905) 845-1444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 21 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2008